There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Functional Gastrointestinal and Motility Disorders Research Enhancement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the research activities of the National Institutes of Health with respect to functional gastrointestinal and motility disorders, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/20/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/18/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/20/2019 Referred to

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3396 - Functional Gastrointestinal and Motility Disorders Research Enhancement Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3396. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/2019)

Functional Gastrointestinal and Motility Disorders Research Enhancement Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Institutes of Health to expand, intensify, and coordinate its activities with respect to functional gastrointestinal and motility disorders (FGIMDs), including by

  • expanding basic and clinical research into FGIMDs by implementing the research recommendations of the National Commission on Digestive Diseases,
  • providing support for the establishment of centers of excellence on FGIMDs,
  • supporting innovative approaches to educating health care providers and patients regarding strategies that improve patient-provider relationships and care,
  • directing the National Institute of Diabetes and Digestive and Kidney Diseases (NIDDK) to provide the necessary funding for the continued expansion and advancement of the FGIMDs research portfolio, and
  • directing NIDDK and the Eunice Kennedy Shriver National Institute of Child Health and Human Development to expand research into FGIMDs that impact children.

The Department of Health and Human Services may engage in public awareness and education activities to increase understanding and recognition of FGIMDs.