There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure consideration of water intensity in the Department of Energy's energy research, development, and demonstration programs to help guarantee efficient, reliable, and sustainable delivery of energy and clean water resources.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7177-7178)
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/23/2019-3:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-3:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7177-7178)
07/23/2019-3:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 34.
07/23/2019-3:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7177-7179)
07/23/2019-3:07pmHouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/27/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
03/27/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy
02/12/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/14/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/03/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy02/12/2019 Referred to
03/27/2019 Markup by
03/27/2019 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/2019 Referred to

As of 11/12/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.34 - Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to integrate water considerations into its energy research, development, and demonstration programs and projects.

Specifically, the DOE must develop and implement a strategic plan that (1) advances energy and energy efficiency technologies and practices to minimize freshwater withdrawal and consumption, increase water use efficiency, and utilize nontraditional water sources; (2) considers the effects climate variability may have on water supplies and quality for energy generation and fuel production; and (3) improves the understanding of the energy required to provide reliable water supplies as well as the water required to provide reliable energy supplies. The plan must be updated every five years.

In addition, DOE must establish an Energy-Water Subcommittee of the Energy Advisory Board to promote and enable improved energy and water resource data collection, reporting, and technological innovation.