There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations for Humanitarian Assistance and Security at the Southern Border Act, 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations for Humanitarian Assistance and Security at the Southern Border Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations for Humanitarian Assistance and Security at the Southern Border Act, 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations for Humanitarian Assistance and Security at the Southern Border Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/01/2019Became Public Law No: 116-26.
07/01/2019Signed by President.
06/28/2019Presented to President.
06/27/2019Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 305 - 102 (Roll no. 429).(text: CR H5246-5248)
06/26/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 06/26/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 84 - 8. Record Vote Number: 185.
06/26/2019Failed of passage/not agreed to in Senate: Under the order of 06/26/19, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, H.R. 3401 failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 37 - 55. Record Vote Number: 182.
06/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 195 (Roll no. 414).(text: CR H5147-5150)
06/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (37)

Date Chamber
07/01/2019Became Public Law No: 116-26.
07/01/2019Signed by President.
06/28/2019HousePresented to President.
06/27/2019-5:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2019-5:19pmHouseOn motion the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 305 - 102 (Roll no. 429). (text: CR H5246-5248)
06/27/2019-4:54pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/27/2019-4:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the motion to agree in the Senate amendment to H.R. 3401
06/27/2019-4:43pmHouseMrs. Lowey moved that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5246-5250)
06/27/2019-4:43pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 466, Mrs. Lowey called up H.R. 3401 and offered a motion.
06/27/2019-4:11pmHouseRule H. Res. 466 passed House.
06/27/2019-9:06amHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 466 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of Senate amendment to H.R. 3401.
06/26/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/26/2019SenatePassed Senate, under the order of 06/26/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 84 - 8. Record Vote Number: 185.
06/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.901 Amendment SA 901, under the order of 06/26/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 84 - 8. Record Vote Number: 184.
06/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.902 Motion to table amendment SA 902 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 15. Record Vote Number: 183.
06/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.902 Amendment SA 902 proposed by Senator Paul to Amendment SA 901. (consideration: CR S4541-4542; text: CR S4542) To rescind $4,586,000,000 from foreign assistance and exchange programs.
06/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.901 Amendment SA 901 proposed by Senator Shelby. (consideration: CR S4541-4542) In the nature of a substitute.
06/26/2019SenateUnder the order of 06/26/19, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, H.R. 3401 failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 37 - 55. Record Vote Number: 182.
06/26/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4531-4543)
06/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/25/2019-9:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2019-9:49pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 195 (Roll no. 414). (text: CR H5147-5150)
06/25/2019-9:43pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 205 - 218 (Roll no. 413).
06/25/2019-9:37pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
06/25/2019-9:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rutherford motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to increase funding for ICE by $64,621,000.
06/25/2019-9:26pmHouseMr. Rutherford moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H5161)
06/25/2019-9:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5161-5163)
06/25/2019-8:49pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 3401.
06/25/2019-8:49pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/25/2019-7:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3401.
06/25/2019-7:33pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3401 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
06/25/2019-7:33pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 462. (consideration: CR H5147-5159)
06/25/2019-7:33pmHouseRule H. Res. 462 passed House.
06/25/2019-6:02pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 462 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3401 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
06/21/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/21/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/21/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations06/21/2019 Referred to
House Budget06/21/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3401. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/25/2019)

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations for Humanitarian Assistance and Security at the Southern Border Act, 2019

This bill provides $4.5 billion in FY2019 emergency supplemental appropriations to federal departments and agencies for humanitarian assistance and security to respond to migrants attempting to enter the United States at the southern border.

The funding provided by this bill is designated as emergency spending, which is exempt from discretionary spending limits.

The bill provides appropriations to the Department of Justice for the Executive Office for Immigration Review and the U.S. Marshals Service.

Within the Department of Homeland Security, the bill provides appropriations for

  • U.S. Customs and Border Protection,
  • U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and
  • the Federal Emergency Management Agency.

The bill provides appropriations to the Department of Health and Human Services for the Administration for Children and Families.

The bill also sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this bill.