There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Coast Guard Academy Improvement Act
  • Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • Coast Guard Academy Improvement Act
  • Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 2019
  • Pay Our Coast Guard Parity Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Coast Guard Academy Improvement Act
  • Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for the Coast Guard, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7263-7284)
07/23/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-172.
06/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/25/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/24/2019-1:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2019-1:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7263-7284)
07/24/2019-1:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3409.
07/24/2019-1:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7263-7287)
07/24/2019-1:20pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132.
07/23/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-172.
06/26/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2019HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
06/24/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/21/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/21/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/21/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
07/23/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-172
House Transportation Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation06/24/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/2019)

Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes the U.S. Coast Guard and the Federal Maritime Commission for FY2020-FY2021, and authorizes a specified level of end-of-year strength for active duty personnel and military training student loads to the Coast Guard for such fiscal years.

Among other things, the bill addresses (1) retirement grades for Coast Guard personnel, (2) promotion authority for Coast Guard personnel, (3) the use of unmanned maritime and aircraft systems in the Coast Guard, and (4) diversity at the Coast Guard Academy.

The bill revises or sets forth policies relating to the Coast Guard, including

  • passenger vessel security and safety requirements,
  • vessel operation requirements,
  • coastwise endorsement determinations,
  • Coast Guard advisory committees,
  • safety zones to address special activities such as offshore energy development in the exclusive economic zone,
  • the use of engine cut-off switches on recreational vessels,
  • polar security cutter acquisitions, and
  • vessel certification extensions.