There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide for certain acquisition authorities for the Under Secretary of Management of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/10/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 4 (Roll no. 56).
08/30/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-190.
06/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/11/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/10/2020-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/10/2020-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 4 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H995-997)
02/10/2020-7:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1000)
02/10/2020-4:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/10/2020-4:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3413.
02/10/2020-4:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H995-997)
02/10/2020-4:37pmHouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/30/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
08/30/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-190.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/17/2019HouseSubcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged.
07/02/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/21/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/21/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 07/25/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security06/21/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
08/30/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-190
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability07/02/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/11/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3413.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3413. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/10/2020)

DHS Acquisition Reform Act of 2019

This bill revises acquisition and procurement programs and activities of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS).

The bill (1) designates the DHS Under Secretary for Management as the DHS Chief Acquisition Officer and sets forth the Under Secretary's acquisition-related duties, (2) sets forth new acquisition responsibilities of the DHS Chief Financial Officer and the DHS Chief Information Officer, and (3) establishes within the Management Directorate of DHS a Program Accountability and Risk Management office and sets forth the responsibilities of its Executive Director.

The DHS Under Secretary for Strategy, Policy, and Plans must ensure that acquisition programs support the DHS Quadrennial Homeland Security Review Report, the DHS Strategic Plan, the DHS Strategic Priorities, and other appropriate successor documents.