There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Safer Pipelines Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to improve the safety of the Nation's natural gas and hazardous liquid pipeline systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
11/20/2019Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/26/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
06/26/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
06/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2019Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/24/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials06/25/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/24/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy06/24/2019 Referred to
06/16/2019 Hearings by
06/26/2019 Markup by
06/26/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3432. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2019)

Safer Pipelines Act of 2019

This bill addresses pipeline safety with respect to natural gas and hazardous liquid pipelines.

Among other things, the bill

  • reauthorizes appropriations through FY2023 for pipeline safety activities;
  • prioritizes assessment methods for transmission pipelines that can provide a greater level of safety than direct assessment, including the use of internal inspection devices or pressure testing;
  • makes it mandatory for each operator of a transmission pipeline facility in a high consequence area to install automatic or remote shutoff valves;
  • directs owners and operators of gas or hazardous liquid pipeline facilities to make critical operational information available to surrounding communities and first responders;
  • increases civil penalties for violations and revises the criminal penalty standard from "knowingly and willfully" to "knowingly or recklessly"; and
  • requires the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration to submit an annual report to Congress detailing its efforts to hire women, minorities, and veterans as inspectors since January 1, 2012.