There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Commission on Scleroderma and Fibrotic Diseases Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a National Commission on Fibrotic Diseases.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/22/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 08/16/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 08/16/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/27/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/10/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 09/10/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/10/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/12/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/19/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/19/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 10/17/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/30/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 11/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 11/21/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/22/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/10/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/10/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/10/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/08/2020
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 01/08/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/08/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 01/15/2020
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/28/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/26/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/24/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2019)

National Commission on Scleroderma and Fibrotic Diseases Act of 2019

This bill temporarily establishes a National Commission on Fibrotic Diseases within the National Institutes of Health that must recommend improvements regarding fibrosis and fibrotic disease research.