There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

HELP Separated Children Act of 2019
Humane Enforcement and Legal Protections for Separated Children Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect children affected by immigration enforcement actions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/09/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/18/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/22/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/22/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/02/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/25/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/11/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/30/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 10/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/19/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 01/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/24/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship07/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.