There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Help Separated Families Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend part E of title IV of the Social Security Act to ensure that immigration status alone does not disqualify a parent, legal guardian, or relative from being a placement for a foster child, to authorize discretion to a State, county, or other political subdivision of a State to delay filing for termination of parental rights in foster care cases in which an otherwise fit and willing parent or legal guardian has been deported or is involved in (including detention pursuant to) an immigration proceeding, unless certain conditions have been met, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/24/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/27/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/09/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/15/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/18/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/22/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/22/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/22/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 08/02/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/02/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/20/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/25/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/11/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/30/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/14/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/24/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3452.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2019)

Help Separated Families Act of 2019

This bill prohibits states from disqualifying a prospective adoptive or foster parent based on that person's immigration status. It also expands the requirements for state foster-care cases in which a parent has been detained or deported as the result of an immigration proceeding.

Specifically, states may not initiate a proceeding to terminate the parental rights of a parent who has been detained or deported unless the state has made reasonable efforts to (1) locate the parent, (2) notify the parent about the proceeding, (3) provide the parent with appropriate services, and (4) reunify the parent and child. States also must (1) ensure that case managers can communicate in separated children's native language, (2) provide assistance for separated children to accompany their parent to the family's country of origin, (3) keep information about such children confidential, and (4) publish a list of legal services available to separated children.

Further, case management plans must provide (1) the location of the child's parent who has been detained or deported, and (2) a written record of information about such child that is disclosed to government agencies or nonlegal guardians. The bill requires states to accept specified forms of foreign identification to complete background checks for prospective foster care placements. States also must notify prospective foster or adoptive relatives that such relatives' immigration status will not be requested except with respect to eligibility for certain social services.