There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fallen Journalists Memorial Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Fallen Journalists Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 07/09/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/10/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/23/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/25/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/25/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/25/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/30/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/30/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/30/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/30/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/20/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/20/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/20/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/25/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands07/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3465. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2019)

Fallen Journalists Memorial Act of 2019

This bill authorizes the Fallen Journalists Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work on federal land in commemoration of the sacrifices made by journalists for a free and independent press.