Text: H.R.347 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (03/06/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 347


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 6, 2019

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources


AN ACT

To extend the authorization of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 relating to the disposal site in Mesa County, Colorado.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Responsible Disposal Reauthorization Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Authorization.

Section 112(a)(1)(B) of the Uranium Mill Tailings Radiation Control Act of 1978 (42 U.S.C. 7922(a)(1)(B)) is amended by striking “September 30, 2023” and inserting “September 30, 2031”.

Passed the House of Representatives March 5, 2019.

    Attest: cheryl l. johnson,   
    Clerk.