There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Integration of Baseball Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint commemorative coins in recognition of the 75th anniversary of the integration of baseball.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/25/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 06/25/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 06/25/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/25/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/26/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/27/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/16/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 08/27/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/27/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3483. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2019)

Integration of Baseball Commemorative Coin Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue $5 gold coins, $1 silver coins, and half-dollar clad coins in recognition and celebration of the 75th anniversary of the integration of the game of baseball.

All sales of such coins shall include specified surcharges. All surcharges received by Treasury shall be distributed to the National Baseball Hall of Fame, with the understanding that the Hall of Fame shall work with the Jackie Robinson Foundation to develop and operate education programs about the integration of the game of baseball and to preserve artifacts related to the integration of the game.