There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SECURE Our Democracy Act
Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expose and deter unlawful and subversive foreign interference in elections for Federal office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/09/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 07/15/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/15/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/26/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary06/26/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services06/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.