There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting People From Surprise Medical Bills Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act and title XI of the Social Security Act to protect health care consumers from surprise billing practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5176)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/27/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/27/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/09/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/09/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/09/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 07/12/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 07/12/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 07/12/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 07/18/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/18/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 07/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/18/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/18/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 07/18/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/18/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 07/18/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/18/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 07/18/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 07/30/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/09/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 08/09/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/09/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/09/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/09/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 08/16/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/16/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/11/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/11/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/20/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/20/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/27/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/27/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/27/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 09/27/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/27/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/16/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/16/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 10/16/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 10/23/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/23/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 10/31/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/26/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform06/26/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor06/26/2019 Referred to

As of 11/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3502 - Protecting People From Surprise Medical Bills Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3502. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2019)

Protecting People From Surprise Medical Bills Act

This bill makes a series of changes relating to health care costs and billing practices.

Among other things, the bill

  • applies in-network cost-sharing requirements to certain emergency and related non-emergency services that are provided out-of-network;
  • requires health insurers to include in-network and out-of-network deductibles, as well as out-of-pocket maximum limitations, on enrollee insurance cards;
  • requires health insurers to provide online and print directories of in-network health care providers; and
  • prohibits health care providers from billing individuals for services more than a year after such services are provided.