There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Ryan Kules and Paul Benne Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Other Short Titles

Ryan Kules and Paul Benne Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ryan Kules Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Ryan Kules Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ryan Kules Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ryan Kules and Paul Benne Specially Adaptive Housing Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for improvements to the specially adapted housing program and educational assistance programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for improvements to the specially adapted housing program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/2020Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2020Signed by President.
07/28/2020Presented to President.
07/20/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
03/26/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7207-7209)
07/22/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-164.
06/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/2020Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2020Signed by President.
07/28/2020HousePresented to President.
07/20/2020-1:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/2020-1:21pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3111-3113)
07/20/2020-1:21pmHouseMr. Takano asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table the bill, H.R. 3504, and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3111-3113)
03/26/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/26/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/26/2020SenateS.Amdt.1579 Amendment SA 1579 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/26/2020SenateS.Amdt.1579 Amendment SA 1579 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S2158; text: CR S2156-2158) In the nature of a substitute.
03/26/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2158)
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/23/2019-5:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-5:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7207-7209)
07/23/2019-5:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3504.
07/23/2019-5:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7207-7211)
07/23/2019-5:20pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/22/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 124.
07/22/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-164.
07/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/26/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 06/26/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs06/26/2019 Referred to
07/22/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-164
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity07/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.