There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

LGBTQ Data Inclusion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve Federal population surveys by requiring the collection of voluntary, self-disclosed information on sexual orientation and gender identity in certain surveys, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (142)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/05/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/05/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/05/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/05/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/16/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/16/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/16/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/16/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/16/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/22/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/22/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/22/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 08/27/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/27/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/27/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/27/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/27/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/27/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/27/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 08/27/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/27/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 08/27/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 08/27/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/09/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/09/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/20/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/20/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 09/20/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/30/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 11/12/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 11/15/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 12/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/19/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/19/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 12/19/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 01/27/2020
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/27/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/27/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/28/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/18/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/21/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform06/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3509. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2019)

LGBTQ Data Inclusion Act

This bill requires federal agencies that collect information through a survey that includes demographic data (where subjects self-report information or a proxy provides information about the subject or responds for all persons in a household) to review existing data sets to determine in which data sets information about sexual orientation and gender identity is not included, and to assess needed changes in survey methods related to asking questions on sexual orientation and gender identity.

Agencies that publish reports relying on survey demographic data must include information on sexual orientation and gender identity.