There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore Honor to Service Members Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Defense to review the discharge characterization of former members of the Armed Forces who were discharged by reason of the sexual orientation of the member, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 06/26/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/15/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 07/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/26/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/26/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.