There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Northern Triangle and Border Stabilization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support the people of Central America and strengthen United States national security by addressing the root causes of migration from El Salvador, Guatemala and Honduras, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
08/02/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Education and Labor, Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/09/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/10/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/10/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/12/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/12/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/18/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2019

Committees (9)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship07/30/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor06/27/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services06/27/2019 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/27/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services06/27/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security06/27/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations08/02/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/27/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture06/27/2019 Referred to

As of 09/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3524 - Northern Triangle and Border Stabilization Act


Subjects (85)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.