There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/22/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H974)
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/23/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/23/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E80-81)
01/22/2019-5:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/22/2019-5:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H974)
01/22/2019-4:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 353.
01/22/2019-4:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H974-976)
01/22/2019-4:51pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/10/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/22/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations01/23/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.353. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (01/22/2019)

This bill directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual reports concerning Taiwan's participation at the World Health Organization's World Health Assembly (WHA) as an observer. The report shall describe changes and improvements to the State Department's plan to support Taiwan's observer status at the WHA, following any meetings at which Taiwan did not participate under such status. (China has opposed Taiwan's participation, based on its position that Taiwan is part of China and not a separate country.)