There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to codify the Boots to Business Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/13/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 612).(text: CR H8797-8798)
10/15/2019Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-236.
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/14/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
11/13/2019-5:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2019-5:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 612). (text: CR H8797-8798)
11/13/2019-4:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8812)
11/13/2019-1:01pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2019-12:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3537.
11/13/2019-12:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8797-8800)
11/13/2019-12:41pmHouseMr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/15/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
10/15/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-236.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/27/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
06/27/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business06/27/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
10/15/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-236
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship11/14/2019 Referred to

As of 02/17/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3537 - Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (11/13/2019)

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2019

This bill provides statutory authority for the Boots to Business Program, which provides entrepreneurship training to individuals including veterans and active members of the Armed Forces, to be administered by the Small Business Administration.