There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ensuring Safe Capital Access for All Small Businesses Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that certain loan programs of the Small Business Administration are made available to cannabis-related legitimate businesses and service providers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business06/27/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/27/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/28/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/27/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands07/16/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture06/27/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry07/19/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security07/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

Ensuring Safe Capital Access for All Small Businesses Act of 2019

This bill removes cannabis from the schedule of controlled substances, and it prohibits the Small Business Administration from declining to provide certain small business loans to an eligible entity solely because it is a cannabis-related legitimate business or service provider.