There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Homegrown Act of 2019.

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To decriminalize cannabis, to establish an Equitable Licensing Grant Program in the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/29/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/27/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/28/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security07/30/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture06/27/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry07/29/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/27/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands07/24/2019 Referred to
House Small Business06/27/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3544. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

Homegrown Act of 2019.

This bill removes marijuana from the list of scheduled substances under the Controlled Substances Act and eliminates criminal penalties for an individual who manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana.

Additionally, the bill requires the Small Business Administration to establish the Equitable Licensing Grant Program. The purpose of the grant program is to support the implementation of cannabis licensing programs that minimize barriers to licensing and employment for individuals adversely impacted by the war on drugs.