There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Financial Stability Act of 2010 to require the Financial Stability Oversight Council to consider alternative approaches before determining that a U.S. nonbank financial company shall be supervised by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/25/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/25/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/25/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/25/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 07/25/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/30/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/30/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/30/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/28/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/28/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 11/13/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 11/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/15/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/15/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 12/09/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/09/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/14/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/14/2020
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/14/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 02/14/2020
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/03/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/27/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2019

The bill requires the Financial Stability Oversight Council, prior to determining that a U.S. nonbank financial company shall be supervised by the Federal Reserve Board and therefore subject to certain prudential standards, to first determine that certain alternative actions would not mitigate the threat the company may pose to U.S. financial stability