There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Shackling and Detaining Pregnant Women Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the humane treatment of pregnant women by reinstating the presumption of release and prohibiting shackling, restraining, and other inhumane treatment of pregnant detainees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/27/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/27/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 07/16/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/16/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/16/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/16/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 07/30/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/27/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 08/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/27/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/27/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/12/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 11/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security07/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3563. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

Stop Shackling and Detaining Pregnant Women Act

This bill prohibits the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) from detaining a woman during pregnancy or postpartum recovery and must immediately release any detainee found to be pregnant, unless such woman presents an immediate and serious threat of hurting herself or others.

A DHS detention facility may not use a restraint on a detainee who is known to be pregnant, including during labor, transport to a medical facility or birthing center, and delivery, or during postpartum recovery, except for medical or safety purposes. The bill requires DHS to use the least restrictive restraint necessary and prohibits certain specified restraint types, including four-point restraints and binding a detainee's hands behind her back.

The bill prohibits DHS detention officers from being present during a pelvic exam of a detainee, labor, delivery, or treatment relating to a pregnancy, unless specifically requested by medical personnel. If a detention officer is requested by medical personnel, such officer shall be female, if practicable, and remain at a reasonable distance from the detainee.

The bill requires that a pregnant detainee shall have access to health care services, including comprehensive services relating to reproductive health care and pregnancy.