There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fairness for High-Skilled Americans Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to eliminate the Optional Practical Training Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/06/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/09/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 11/14/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/18/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 11/26/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 05/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/27/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship07/30/2019 Referred to

As of 08/08/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3564 - Fairness for High-Skilled Americans Act of 2019


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3564. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

Fairness for High-Skilled Americans Act of 2019

This bill eliminates the Optional Practical Training Program or any successor program, unless Congress expressly authorizes such a program. (The program provides an F-1 student visa holder temporary employment authorization before or after completion of the student's studies, or both.)