There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the effective date for the modification to net operating loss deductions in Public Law 115-97.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7]* 06/27/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/27/2019 Referred to

As of 11/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3587 - To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the effective date for the modification to net operating loss deductions in Public Law 115-97.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3587. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2019)

This bill amends the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act of 2017 (P.L. 115-97) to provide that the net operating carryforward and carryback modifications in that Act are effective for net operating losses arising in taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017 (instead of tax years ending after December 31, 2017).

The bill also allows an extension of the deadline for filing an application for a tentative carryback adjustment for net operating losses arising before January 1, 2018, and ending after December 31, 2017.