There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for certain programs and developments in the Department of Energy concerning the cybersecurity and vulnerabilities of, and physical threats to, the electric grid, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/28/2019Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-254.
01/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559.
09/29/2020-12:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2020-12:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4969-4970)
09/29/2020-12:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 359.
09/29/2020-12:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4969-4971)
09/29/2020-12:33pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/28/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202.
10/28/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-254.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/16/2019HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
05/16/2019HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
01/25/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/09/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/09/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/09/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
10/28/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-254
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy01/25/2019 Referred to
05/16/2019 Markup by
05/16/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/29/2020)

Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act

This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to implement a program to facilitate and encourage public-private partnerships in order to address and mitigate the physical security and cybersecurity risks of electric utilities.

In carrying out the program, DOE must take into consideration different sizes of electric utilities and the regions that such utilities serve, prioritize electric utilities with fewer available resources due to size or region, and utilize and leverage existing DOE programs.