There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Combating Sexual Harassment in Science Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for research to better understand the causes and consequences of sexual harassment affecting individuals in the scientific, technical, engineering, and mathematics workforce and to examine policies to reduce the prevalence and negative impact of such harassment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/08/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/08/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/08/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/08/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/08/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/08/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/08/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/08/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/08/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/08/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/08/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/08/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/08/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/08/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/08/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/24/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 01/24/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/24/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/24/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/24/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/24/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 01/24/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/24/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 01/24/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/24/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/25/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 02/25/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 03/11/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/11/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/11/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/11/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/27/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/27/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/08/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 04/08/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/08/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/01/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/01/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/01/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/01/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/01/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/01/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/01/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/01/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/10/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 05/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/03/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology02/12/2019 Referred to

As of 05/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.36 - Combating Sexual Harassment in Science Act of 2019.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.36. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Combating Sexual Harassment in Science Act of 2019

This bill addresses sexual harassment in the science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) fields by supporting sexual harassment research and efforts to prevent and respond to sexual harassment.

This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to award grants to institutions of higher education or nonprofit organizations (or their consortia) to

  • expand research into sexual harassment in the STEM workforce, including students and trainees; and
  • examine interventions for reducing the incidence and negative consequences of such harassment.

The NSF must convene a working group composed of representatives of federal statistical agencies to develop questions on sexual harassment in STEM departments in order to gather national data on the prevalence, nature, and implications of such harassment in institutions of higher education.

The NSF shall enter into agreements with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine to (1) update a responsible conduct guide issued by the National Academies, and (2) study the influence of sexual harassment in institutions of higher education on the career advancement of individuals in the STEM workforce.

The National Science and Technology Council shall establish an interagency working group to coordinate the federal science agencies' efforts to reduce the prevalence of sexual harassment involving grant personnel.

The Office of Science and Technology Policy must develop a uniform set of policy guidelines for such agencies to prevent and respond to reports of sexual harassment.