There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

High Speed Gunfire Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit bump stocks and other devices designed to accelerate the rate of fire of a semiautomatic weapon.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/02/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 07/02/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 07/02/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/02/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/16/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 08/06/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 08/06/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 08/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 08/23/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/02/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security07/30/2019 Referred to

As of 10/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3606 - High Speed Gunfire Prevention Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.