There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Restricting Credit Checks for Employment Decisions Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Restricting Credit Checks for Employment Decisions Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to ban the use of credit information for most employment decisions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-305.
07/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
11/21/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-305.
07/11/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/11/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/02/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 07/10/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 07/10/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 07/10/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/15/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/06/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services07/02/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
11/21/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-305

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3614. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (11/21/2019)

Restricting Credit Checks for Employment Decisions Act

This bill generally prohibits a consumer reporting agency from providing a consumer's credit information for employment purposes, unless otherwise required by law or for a national security investigation.