There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Surprises Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act to protect health care consumers from surprise billing practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/11/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/11/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/09/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2019Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/09/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/12/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/09/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/10/2019 Referred to
06/12/2019 Hearings by
07/11/2019 Markup by
07/11/2019 Reported by
House Education and Labor07/09/2019 Referred to

As of 01/22/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3630 - No Surprises Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3630. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/09/2019)

No Surprises Act

This bill expands restrictions on charging health care plan holders out-of-network rates for certain services. First, the bill requires insurers offering plans that cover emergency services to bill plan holders no more than the median in-network rate for a particular emergency service, even if the service provider is out of network. The bill further prohibits insurers from billing plan holders more than the median in-network rate for nonemergency services provided by out-of-network providers at in-network facilities.

Out-of-network providers may not bill plan holders for the difference between the in-network and out-of-network rates for emergency services. The bill further prohibits out-of-network providers from billing plan holders for the difference in rates for nonemergency services provided at an in-network facility unless the provider complies with specified notice and consent requirements. Even when complying with these requirements, an out-of-network provider may not charge plan holders for the difference in rates for such nonemergency services if the provider is based at the in-network facility and is the only provider available to deliver the particular treatment or service at the facility.

The Department of Health and Human Services must provide grants to states to establish or maintain All Payer Claims Databases, which publish claims and payment information from insurers.

The bill also requires insurers to publish provider directories and requires the Government Accountability Office and the Department of Labor to report on certain issues related to the commercial health care market.