There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Accountability for Migrant Deaths Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security and the Secretary of Health and Human Services to notify Congress of each foreign national who dies in the custody of the Secretary, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/09/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 07/09/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/11/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/11/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/11/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/11/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/11/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/11/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/11/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/17/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/17/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/17/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 07/17/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/17/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/17/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/17/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/17/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/17/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/23/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/23/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/23/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/23/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/23/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/09/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship07/30/2019 Referred to
House Rules07/09/2019 Referred to

As of 10/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3660 - Accountability for Migrant Deaths Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.