There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Asuncion Valdivia Heat Illness and Fatality Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Occupational Safety and Health Administration to issue an occupational safety and health standard to protect workers from heat-related injuries and illnesses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 07/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/10/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/11/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 07/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/15/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 07/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/23/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/24/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/24/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 07/24/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 08/02/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 08/02/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 08/02/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 08/06/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/09/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/09/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/13/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/23/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/27/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 09/09/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/11/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/17/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/16/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/23/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 11/01/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 11/08/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/15/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/13/2020
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/21/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/27/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 01/28/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/06/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/06/2020
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 02/07/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/21/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/31/2020
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 08/14/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 08/14/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/14/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/10/2019 Referred to

As of 09/29/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3668 - Asuncion Valdivia Heat Illness and Fatality Prevention Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3668. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2019)

Asuncion Valdivia Heat Illness and Fatality Prevention Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Labor to promulgate an occupational safety or health standard on prevention of exposure to excessive heat. Excessive heat includes outdoor or indoor exposure to heat at levels that exceed the capacities of the body to maintain normal body functions and may cause heat-related injury, illness, or fatality.

In addition, the bill establishes requirements concerning (1) training and education to prevent and respond to heat illness, and (2) whistle-blower protections.