Text: H.R.3684 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3684


To repeal certain obsolete laws relating to Indians.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

July 10, 2019

Mr. O'Halleran (for himself, Mr. Cole, and Mr. Johnson of South Dakota) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources


A BILL

To repeal certain obsolete laws relating to Indians.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as “An Act Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes”.

SEC. 2. Repeal of certain obsolete laws relating to Indians.

(1) Section 2080 of the Revised Statutes (25 U.S.C. 72) is repealed.

(2) Section 2100 of the Revised Statutes (25 U.S.C. 127) is repealed.

(3) Section 2 of the Act of March 3, 1875 (18 Stat. 449, chapter 132; 25 U.S.C. 128), is repealed.

(4) The first section of the Act of March 3, 1875 (18 Stat. 424, chapter 132; 25 U.S.C. 129), is amended under the heading “Cheyennes and Arapahoes.” by striking “; that the Secretary of the Interior be authorized to withhold, from any tribe of Indians who may hold any captives other than Indians, any moneys due them from the United States until said captives shall be surrendered to the lawful authorities of the United States”.

(5) Section 2087 of the Revised Statutes (25 U.S.C. 130) is repealed.

(6) Section 3 of the Act of March 3, 1875 (18 Stat. 449, chapter 132; 25 U.S.C. 137), is repealed.

(7) Section 2101 of the Revised Statutes (25 U.S.C. 138) is repealed.

(8) Section 7 of the Act of June 23, 1879 (21 Stat. 35, chapter 35; 25 U.S.C. 273), is repealed.

(9) The first section of the Act of March 3, 1893 (27 Stat. 612, chapter 209), is amended—

(A) under the heading “Miscellaneous Supports.” (27 Stat. 628; 25 U.S.C. 283), by striking the last 2 undesignated paragraphs; and

(B) under the heading “For Support of Schools.” (27 Stat. 635; 25 U.S.C. 283), by striking the second undesignated paragraph.

(10) Section 18 of the Act of June 30, 1913 (38 Stat. 96, chapter 4; 25 U.S.C. 285), is amended by striking the tenth undesignated paragraph.

(11) The Act of June 21, 1906 (34 Stat. 325, chapter 3504), is amended under the heading “Commissioner.” under the heading “I. General Provisions.” (34 Stat. 328; 25 U.S.C. 302) by striking the fourth undesignated paragraph.