There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Energy to carry out a program relating to physical security and cybersecurity for pipelines and liquefied natural gas facilities.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/20/2019Committee on Transportation discharged.
11/20/2019Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-303, Part I.
01/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
11/20/2019Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged.
11/20/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/20/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 244.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Committee on Transportation discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure for a period ending not later than Nov. 20, 2019 for consideration of such provisions of the bill as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(r) of rule X.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2019Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-303, Part I.
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/16/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
05/16/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 06/03/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/09/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
11/20/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-303
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy01/25/2019 Referred to
05/16/2019 Markup by
05/16/2019 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/20/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials11/20/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House, Part I (11/20/2019)

Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act

This bill requires the Department of Energy to implement a program to ensure the security, resiliency, and survivability of natural gas pipelines, hazardous liquid pipelines, and liquefied natural gas facilities.