There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dollars for the Wall Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to terminate the designation of income tax payments to the Presidential Election Campaign Fund and to provide for the designation of income tax payments to the Border Wall Trust Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/11/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 07/11/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 07/11/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/24/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 10/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/11/2019 Referred to

As of 02/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3717 - Dollars for the Wall Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3717. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/11/2019)

Dollars for the Wall Act

This bill terminates after 2018 the taxpayer checkoff provisions of the Internal Revenue Code for payments to the Presidential Election Campaign Fund and replaces them with a taxpayer checkoff for payments to the Border Wall Trust Fund.