There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honoring Our Fallen TSA Officers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to provide for the eligibility of Transportation Security Administration employees to receive public safety officers' death benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/09/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/09/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/10/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/14/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 01/14/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/15/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/22/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/22/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 01/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/23/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 01/23/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/24/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/28/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/28/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 01/30/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/06/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/06/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/08/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/13/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/22/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/05/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/12/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 03/13/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 03/13/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/25/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/08/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/10/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/29/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/30/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 05/07/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/15/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/21/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/22/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/30/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/27/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/27/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/27/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/27/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/27/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/12/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/15/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 08/09/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/09/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/09/2019 Referred to

As of 08/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.372 - Honoring Our Fallen TSA Officers Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2019)

Honoring Our Fallen TSA Officers Act

This bill extends public safety officers' death benefits to Transportation Security Administration employees performing official duties related to protecting the nation's transportation systems.