There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SERV Act
Successful Entrepreneurship for Reservists and Veterans Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

SERV Act
Successful Entrepreneurship for Reservists and Veterans Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SERV Act
Successful Entrepreneurship for Reservists and Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Comptroller General of the United States to report on access to credit for small business concerns owned and controlled by covered individuals, to require the Administrator of the Small Business Administration to report on the veterans interagency task force, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/13/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 614).(text: CR H8803)
10/15/2019Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-233.
07/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/14/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
11/13/2019-5:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2019-5:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 614). (text: CR H8803)
11/13/2019-5:11pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8813-8814)
11/13/2019-1:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2019-1:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3734.
11/13/2019-1:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8803-8805)
11/13/2019-1:21pmHouseMr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/15/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 185.
10/15/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-233.
07/17/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
07/17/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
07/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
07/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 07/17/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/30/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 09/06/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/24/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/12/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
10/15/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-233
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship11/14/2019 Referred to

As of 01/26/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3734 - Successful Entrepreneurship for Reservists and Veterans Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.