There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make grants to entities that provide legal services for homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/12/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/27/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/25/2020-4:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/25/2020-4:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1177)
02/25/2020-4:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3749.
02/25/2020-4:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1176-1179)
02/25/2020-4:35pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/16/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/16/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/12/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 07/12/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 07/17/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/22/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/25/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/25/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/06/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/30/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/06/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/16/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/17/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/24/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/04/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/05/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 11/12/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/15/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 11/18/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 11/19/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/19/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 12/04/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 12/06/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/06/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/10/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/11/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/11/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/12/2019 Referred to
10/16/2019 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity08/14/2019 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/27/2020 Referred to

As of 08/15/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3749 - Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/25/2020)

Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make grants to eligible entities that provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness. To be eligible, an entity must (1) be a public or nonprofit private entity with the capacity to effectively administer a grant, (2) demonstrate that adequate financial support will be available to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness, and (3) agree to meet the VA's established requirements and demonstrate a capacity to meet such requirements.

The bill requires the VA to (1) use a specified portion of the grants to provide legal services to women veterans, and (2) report on areas where VA programs are failing to meet the needs of women veterans who are homeless.