There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian Tribes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 323 - 96 (Roll no. 208).(text: CR H3813)
01/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
05/15/2019-4:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2019-4:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 323 - 96 (Roll no. 208). (text: CR H3813)
05/15/2019-3:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3824-3825)
05/15/2019-2:21pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/15/2019-1:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 375.
05/15/2019-1:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3813-3816)
05/15/2019-1:54pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 7.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
04/03/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/09/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/09/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/09/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States02/05/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Hearings by
05/01/2019 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs05/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/15/2019)

This bill applies the Indian Reorganization Act to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when a tribe became recognized. The amendments made by this bill are retroactively effective as if included in the Indian Reorganization Act. This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Department of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been under federal jurisdiction when the Indian Reorganization Act was enacted.