There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cady Housh and Gemesha Thomas Student Suicide Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize certain grants (for youth suicide early intervention and prevention strategies) to be used for school personnel in elementary and secondary schools and students in secondary schools to receive student suicide awareness and prevention training, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/16/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/23/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/23/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 07/23/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 09/13/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/13/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 09/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/17/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/11/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/11/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/11/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/11/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/11/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/11/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/11/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/11/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/11/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/18/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/21/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/21/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/08/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 11/14/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/15/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 11/15/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 11/15/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/12/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/17/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor07/16/2019 Referred to

As of 08/14/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3778 - Cady Housh and Gemesha Thomas Student Suicide Prevention Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3778. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2019)

Cady Housh and Gemesha Thomas Student Suicide Prevention Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes through FY2025, and otherwise revises, grants administered by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration (SAMHSA) to support youth suicide early-intervention and prevention strategies. Specifically, the bill requires SAMHSA to award a portion of such grants for statewide training programs on emotional well-being, mental health, and suicide awareness and prevention for elementary and secondary school students and staff.