There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act Amendments of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Radiation Exposure Compensation Act to improve compensation for workers involved in uranium mining, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/06/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 07/16/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/16/2019
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/16/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/16/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/16/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/23/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/30/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 12/04/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 12/06/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties08/06/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor07/16/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.