There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Land Renewable Energy Development Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the development of renewable energy on public lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/25/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
07/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 07/17/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 07/18/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/18/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/23/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/24/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/24/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/30/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 08/16/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/17/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/17/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Hearings by
House Agriculture07/17/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry08/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.