There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Second Look Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enable incarcerated persons to petition a Federal court for a second look at sentences longer than 10 years, where the person is not a danger to the safety of any person or the community, and has shown they are ready for reentry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 11/18/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/26/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.