There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Medical Marijuana Research Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Medical Marijuana Research Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Medical Marijuana Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to make marijuana accessible for use by qualified marijuana researchers for medical purposes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/09/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
12/07/2020Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
12/07/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-619, Part I.
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2020SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/10/2020SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/09/2020-2:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/09/2020-2:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7076-7078)
12/09/2020-2:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3797.
12/09/2020-2:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7076-7083)
12/09/2020-2:04pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/07/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 508.
12/07/2020HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
12/07/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-619, Part I.
09/09/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/09/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/06/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/18/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/17/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce07/17/2019 Referred to
09/09/2020 Markup by
12/07/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-619
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/18/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary07/17/2019 Referred to
12/07/2020 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/06/2019 Referred to
Senate Judiciary12/18/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3797. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/17/2019)

Medical Marijuana Research Act of 2019

This bill establishes a new, separate registration process to facilitate medical marijuana research.

Specifically, it directs the Drug Enforcement Administration to register (1) practitioners to conduct medical marijuana research, and (2) manufacturers and distributors to supply marijuana for such research.

Additionally, the Department of Health and Human Services must continue to produce marijuana through the National Institute on Drug Abuse Drug Supply Program and offer to sell immature plants and seeds to researchers until manufacturers and distributors can provide a sufficient supply of marijuana for medical research.