There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reuniting Families Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Filipino Veterans Family Reunification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to promote family unity, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 07/17/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/22/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/22/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/22/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/22/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/23/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/02/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 08/02/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 08/02/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 08/02/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 09/06/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/12/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/19/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 09/24/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 09/24/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/25/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/27/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/27/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/04/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 10/08/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 10/16/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/18/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 12/06/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 12/10/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/17/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/07/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/08/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/21/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship08/12/2019 Referred to

As of 01/22/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3799 - Reuniting Families Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.