There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide a means by which nonresidents of a State whose residents may carry concealed firearms may also do so in the State.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (153)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/08/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 01/08/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/08/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/08/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 01/08/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/08/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/08/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/08/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 01/08/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/09/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/09/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 01/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/10/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 01/10/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 01/10/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/14/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/14/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 01/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 01/14/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steven C., Jr. [R-KS-2] 01/14/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/14/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/14/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/14/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/14/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/14/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/15/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/15/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 01/15/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/15/2019
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/15/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/17/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/17/2019
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 01/17/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 01/17/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 01/18/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/22/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/24/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/28/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 01/28/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/29/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 01/29/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 01/29/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/05/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 02/05/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/06/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/11/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 02/13/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 02/26/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/26/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 03/05/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 03/05/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 03/06/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 03/28/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/01/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/01/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/29/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/29/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/03/2019 Referred to

As of 05/25/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.38 - Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2019.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.38. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2019)

Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2019

This bill allows a qualified individual to carry a concealed handgun into or possess a concealed handgun in another state that allows individuals to carry concealed firearms.

A qualified individual must (1) be eligible to possess, transport, or receive a firearm under federal law; (2) carry a valid photo identification document; and (3) carry a valid concealed carry permit issued by any state or be eligible to carry a concealed firearm in his or her state of residence.

Additionally, the bill specifies that a qualified individual who lawfully carries or possesses a concealed handgun in another state (1) is not subject to the federal prohibition on possessing a firearm in a school zone, and (2) may carry or possess the concealed handgun in federally owned lands that are open to the public.