There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PrEP Access and Coverage Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase access to pre-exposure prophylaxis to reduce the transmission of HIV.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
08/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/18/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/17/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/23/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/16/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/01/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/15/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/15/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/22/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/22/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/08/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/18/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/07/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 01/27/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/27/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/30/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/05/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/12/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/21/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/21/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/21/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/18/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/18/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/21/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/21/2020

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce07/17/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/18/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform07/17/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/17/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/14/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/17/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/17/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources07/17/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States08/07/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services07/17/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/18/2019 Referred to
House Financial Services07/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3815. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/17/2019)

PrEP Access and Coverage Act

This bill requires private health insurance plans to cover prescription drugs that prevent the acquisition of HIV, and any related screenings, diagnostic procedures, or clinical follow-ups, without any cost-sharing obligation for the plan holder. Further, insurance plans must not impose any preauthorization requirement for this coverage. These coverage requirements also apply to public health insurance programs, including, among others, Medicare, Medicaid, and the Children's Health Insurance Program.

Additionally, the bill prohibits denying, limiting, or qualifying coverage or increasing premiums for disability insurance, long-term care insurance, or life insurance policies based on a person taking medication for HIV prevention.

The bill further requires the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to states, or directly to eligible local organizations, to provide uninsured individuals access to prescription drugs and related services that prevent HIV. The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention also must develop a public awareness campaign that focuses efforts in communities with a high need for HIV prevention treatment.