There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Farmer Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to require all persons exercising substantial operational control over a concentrated animal feeding operation to jointly obtain a permit for certain discharges, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/19/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/24/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/18/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/19/2019 Referred to

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3844 - Farmer Fairness Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.