There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Violence Against Women Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to improve the provision of services and benefits from the Department of Veterans Affairs for veterans who experience domestic violence or sexual assault, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/11/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
08/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/19/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 07/19/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/22/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/22/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/22/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/25/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 08/13/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/13/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/23/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 10/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/19/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/14/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Hearings by

As of 10/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3867 - Violence Against Women Veterans Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.